LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB301
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB301
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB301
Compare Versions
AB301 Chaptered July 15, 2015
AB301 Enrolled July 7, 2015
AB301 Amended June 24, 2015
AB301 Amended April 15, 2015
AB301 Introduced February 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB301 Chaptered July 15, 2015
AB301 Enrolled July 7, 2015
AB301 Amended June 24, 2015
AB301 Amended April 15, 2015
AB301 Introduced February 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare