California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB304 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 13, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2015

Amended

Bill June 22, 2015
Bill June 18, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill May 22, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015