LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB304
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB304
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB304
Compare Versions
AB304 Enrolled July 13, 2015
AB304 Chaptered July 13, 2015
AB304 Amended June 22, 2015
AB304 Amended June 18, 2015
AB304 Amended June 2, 2015
AB304 Amended May 22, 2015
AB304 Amended April 27, 2015
AB304 Amended April 14, 2015
AB304 Amended March 26, 2015
AB304 Introduced February 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB304 Enrolled July 13, 2015
AB304 Chaptered July 13, 2015
AB304 Amended June 22, 2015
AB304 Amended June 18, 2015
AB304 Amended June 2, 2015
AB304 Amended May 22, 2015
AB304 Amended April 27, 2015
AB304 Amended April 14, 2015
AB304 Amended March 26, 2015
AB304 Introduced February 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare