|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 771, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2605.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2144.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1627.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1589.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|