California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB306 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill July 8, 2015
Bill May 26, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015