|
09/22/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 320, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2732.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2305.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|