California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB313 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2015

Amended

Bill August 25, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015