|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 614, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2745.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2311.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 854.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|