California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB32 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill July 15, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015