California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB332 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Amended

Bill August 24, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill June 15, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015