LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB332
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB332
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB332
Compare Versions
AB332 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB332 Amended August 24, 2015
AB332 Amended July 7, 2015
AB332 Amended June 15, 2015
AB332 Amended April 27, 2015
AB332 Introduced February 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB332 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB332 Amended August 24, 2015
AB332 Amended July 7, 2015
AB332 Amended June 15, 2015
AB332 Amended April 27, 2015
AB332 Introduced February 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare