Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|