California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB34 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Amended

Bill June 2, 2015
Bill May 20, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015