|
09/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 266, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 2606.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2153.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 1622.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1544.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|