California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 4, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill June 17, 2015
Bill May 22, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015