California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB357 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2015

Amended

Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 1, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015
Bill March 25, 2015
Bill March 12, 2015