LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB357
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB357
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB357
Compare Versions
AB357 Amended June 1, 2015
AB357 Amended May 1, 2015
AB357 Amended April 27, 2015
AB357 Amended April 16, 2015
AB357 Amended April 6, 2015
AB357 Amended March 25, 2015
AB357 Amended March 12, 2015
AB357 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB357 Amended June 1, 2015
AB357 Amended May 1, 2015
AB357 Amended April 27, 2015
AB357 Amended April 16, 2015
AB357 Amended April 6, 2015
AB357 Amended March 25, 2015
AB357 Amended March 12, 2015
AB357 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare