|
10/01/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 400, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 2942.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2456.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 22. Page 1688.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|