LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB375
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB375
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB375
Compare Versions
AB375 Chaptered October 1, 2015
AB375 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB375 Amended July 8, 2015
AB375 Amended May 4, 2015
AB375 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB375 Chaptered October 1, 2015
AB375 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB375 Amended July 8, 2015
AB375 Amended May 4, 2015
AB375 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare