California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB376 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 19, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015