LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB376
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB376
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB376
Compare Versions
AB376 Enrolled September 10, 2015
AB376 Amended August 31, 2015
AB376 Amended June 19, 2015
AB376 Amended April 21, 2015
AB376 Amended April 6, 2015
AB376 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB376 Enrolled September 10, 2015
AB376 Amended August 31, 2015
AB376 Amended June 19, 2015
AB376 Amended April 21, 2015
AB376 Amended April 6, 2015
AB376 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare