California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB379 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill June 17, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015
Bill March 17, 2015