LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB379
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB379
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB379
Compare Versions
AB379 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB379 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB379 Amended September 4, 2015
AB379 Amended June 17, 2015
AB379 Amended May 28, 2015
AB379 Amended April 7, 2015
AB379 Amended March 17, 2015
AB379 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB379 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB379 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB379 Amended September 4, 2015
AB379 Amended June 17, 2015
AB379 Amended May 28, 2015
AB379 Amended April 7, 2015
AB379 Amended March 17, 2015
AB379 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare