California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB394 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 15, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 11, 2015

Amended

Bill June 15, 2015
Bill March 19, 2015