LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB394
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB394
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB394
Compare Versions
AB394 Chaptered August 11, 2015
AB394 Enrolled July 15, 2015
AB394 Amended June 15, 2015
AB394 Amended March 19, 2015
AB394 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB394 Chaptered August 11, 2015
AB394 Enrolled July 15, 2015
AB394 Amended June 15, 2015
AB394 Amended March 19, 2015
AB394 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare