|
10/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 431, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2830.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2366.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 1625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|