LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB402
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB402
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB402
Compare Versions
AB402 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB402 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB402 Amended August 26, 2015
AB402 Amended June 30, 2015
AB402 Amended June 16, 2015
AB402 Amended May 18, 2015
AB402 Amended May 5, 2015
AB402 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB402 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB402 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB402 Amended August 26, 2015
AB402 Amended June 30, 2015
AB402 Amended June 16, 2015
AB402 Amended May 18, 2015
AB402 Amended May 5, 2015
AB402 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare