California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB404 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill June 10, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015