LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB404
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB404
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB404
Compare Versions
AB404 Chaptered October 8, 2015
AB404 Enrolled September 9, 2015
AB404 Amended June 10, 2015
AB404 Amended April 13, 2015
AB404 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB404 Chaptered October 8, 2015
AB404 Enrolled September 9, 2015
AB404 Amended June 10, 2015
AB404 Amended April 13, 2015
AB404 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare