|
09/28/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 328, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 20. Page 2607.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 5. Page 2151.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 1330.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|