California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB422 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill July 16, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015
Bill March 17, 2015