California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB428 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 17, 2015
Bill May 21, 2015
Bill May 12, 2015