LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB428
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB428
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB428
Compare Versions
AB428 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB428 Amended August 31, 2015
AB428 Amended June 17, 2015
AB428 Amended May 21, 2015
AB428 Amended May 12, 2015
AB428 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB428 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB428 Amended August 31, 2015
AB428 Amended June 17, 2015
AB428 Amended May 21, 2015
AB428 Amended May 12, 2015
AB428 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare