|
10/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 515, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3056.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2642.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 19. Page 1428.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|