California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB438 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015