|
04/21/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 31. Page 2611.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2155.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 1444.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|