California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB465 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Amended

Bill August 19, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015
Bill April 30, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015