California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB466 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill July 6, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015