LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB466
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB466
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB466
Compare Versions
AB466 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB466 Enrolled August 24, 2016
AB466 Amended August 17, 2016
AB466 Amended June 29, 2016
AB466 Amended July 6, 2015
AB466 Amended March 26, 2015
AB466 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB466 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB466 Enrolled August 24, 2016
AB466 Amended August 17, 2016
AB466 Amended June 29, 2016
AB466 Amended July 6, 2015
AB466 Amended March 26, 2015
AB466 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare