|
06/17/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1352.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1630.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1591.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|