California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB475 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill June 17, 2015

Amended

Bill May 26, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015