California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB487 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Amended

Bill July 15, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015