LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB487
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB487
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB487
Compare Versions
AB487 Enrolled August 31, 2015
AB487 Amended July 15, 2015
AB487 Amended June 30, 2015
AB487 Amended April 16, 2015
AB487 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB487 Enrolled August 31, 2015
AB487 Amended July 15, 2015
AB487 Amended June 30, 2015
AB487 Amended April 16, 2015
AB487 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare