California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB51 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 19, 2016

Amended

Bill June 1, 2016
Bill May 22, 2015
Bill February 11, 2015