LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB51
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB51
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB51
Compare Versions
AB51 Chaptered August 19, 2016
AB51 Enrolled August 5, 2016
AB51 Amended June 1, 2016
AB51 Amended May 22, 2015
AB51 Amended February 11, 2015
AB51 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB51 Chaptered August 19, 2016
AB51 Enrolled August 5, 2016
AB51 Amended June 1, 2016
AB51 Amended May 22, 2015
AB51 Amended February 11, 2015
AB51 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare