California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB514 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Amended

Bill August 26, 2015
Bill July 15, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill June 9, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015