LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB514
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB514
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB514
Compare Versions
AB514 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB514 Amended August 26, 2015
AB514 Amended July 15, 2015
AB514 Amended June 29, 2015
AB514 Amended June 9, 2015
AB514 Amended May 4, 2015
AB514 Amended April 21, 2015
AB514 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB514 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB514 Amended August 26, 2015
AB514 Amended July 15, 2015
AB514 Amended June 29, 2015
AB514 Amended June 9, 2015
AB514 Amended May 4, 2015
AB514 Amended April 21, 2015
AB514 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare