Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4637.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1924.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|