California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB516 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 1, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2016

Amended

Bill June 23, 2016
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015