|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 3141.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2688.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 1922.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|